MA H1562 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4517
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reducing the storage of obsolete court papers. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reducing the storage of obsolete papers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4517
2023-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/03/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S504 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2531 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Motion to lay upon the table pending and postponed to the next session
H4504 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4517 (Replaced by) 2024-06-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback