MA H1549 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-30 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish penalties for the crime of committing sexual abuse against persons with disabilities. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the protection of persons with disabilities
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R] | Rep. Leah Cole [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2016-06-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2016, pending concurrence |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-14 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1549 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1549.pdf |