MA H1530 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5173
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-27 - Accompanied a study order, see H5173
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the rights of victims of certain crimes. The Judiciary.
Title
To enhance the rights of crime victims in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-27 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5173 |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S989 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2976
S958 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H5173 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S958 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1871 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H5173 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1530 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1530.pdf |