MA H1518 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to clarity and consistency for the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1518 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1518.pdf |