MA H15 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 9) as relates to accidental disability and Group 1 emotional distress. Public Service.
Title
Relative to accidental disability and Group 1 emotional distress
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-11-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2021 from 09:30 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2784 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H12 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H12 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H15 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H15.pdf |