MA H12 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Public Employee Retirement Administration Commission (House, No. 9) as relates to the recovery of overearnings. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the recovery of overearnings
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2021-10-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-07-23 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2021 from 09:30 AM-12:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H2784 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H13 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4839 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H61 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
H10 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H11 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - New draft substituted, see H5051
S1740 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
H13 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4839 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H12 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H12.pdf |