MA H15 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4244
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 11) as relates to tax returns. Revenue.
Title
Relative to tax returns
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4244 |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1370 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1869 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1477 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3618 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4143 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1869 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
S1477 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3618 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4143 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2018
H4244 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H15 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H15.pdf |