MA H1493 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H5081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for violations of age of consent laws for adolescents. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying consent laws for adolescents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H5081
2019-11-25JointHearing scheduled for 12/03/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H980 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
H5081 (Replaced by) 2020-11-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback