MA H1472 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4844

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the unlawful passing of a school bus. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the unlawful passing of a school bus

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4844
2021-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H3631 (Similar To) 2022-03-29 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S2311 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
S1572 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1569 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1632 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4844 (Replaced by) 2022-06-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback