MA H1471 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5205
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to screening of prospective school employees for prior investigations into child abuse or sexual misconduct. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing employee screening requirements in schools to prevent child sexual abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5205 |
2022-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-07-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 22, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2616 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
H5205 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5205 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1471 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1471.pdf |