MA H1450 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5276
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reducing damage caused by the current foreclosure crisis in the historic districts of the Commonwealth. Housing.
Title
Relative to reducing damage caused by the current foreclosure crisis in the historic districts of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5276 |
2021-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1326 (Similar To) 2021-12-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5276 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1450 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1450.pdf |