MA H143 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the installation of internet services for abutting owners on private ways. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Internet access on private ways
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H121 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H3439 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
S57 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3439 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4944
S57 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H143 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H143.pdf |