MA H1411 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the reporting requirements of mortgages secured by residential property. The Judiciary.
Title
To increase transparency in the Massachusetts land record systems to protect the property rights of homeowners and businesses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S908 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1411 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1411.pdf |