MA H1347 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sexual assault prosecutions. The Judiciary.
Title
Relating to the age of consent in certain criminal prosecutions for sexual assault and rape of a child
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/01/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1347 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1347.pdf |