MA H1342 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Hunt of Boston, a petition of Daniel J. Hunt that the University of Massachusetts be authorized to designate the student center at the Boston campus as the George V. Kenneally, Jr., student center. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the Honorable George V. Kenneally, Jr
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1342 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1342.pdf |