MA H1326 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to heat in condominium units. Housing.
Title
Relative to heat in condominium units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5089 |
2019-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1925 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1326.pdf |