MA H1308 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to fees for noncriminal hearings for violations of certain motor vehicle laws. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to fees for noncriminal hearings of violations of certain motor vehicle laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-11-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H1310 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2877 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2293 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H2295 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1308 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1308.pdf |