MA H130 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4892
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-8)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4892
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a comprehensive statewide policy concerning streaming entertainment services and the recovery of municipal costs for the management and maintenance of digital infrastructure. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Relative to a streaming entertainment operator’s use of the public rights-of-way
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4892 |
2022-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
H4892 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H130.pdf |