MA H1298 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5201
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to asset limits for the Medicaid program during the COVID-19 state of emergency. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to health care eligibility for those affected by COVID-19
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5201 |
2021-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/28/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H536 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H1434 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5268
H1868 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2055 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1434 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5268
H1868 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2055 (Similar To) 2022-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5023
H5201 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1298 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1298.pdf |