MA H1278 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to higher education recordkeeping responsibilities. Higher Education.
Title
Assisting with higher education recordkeeping responsibilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4142 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Hearing scheduled for 02/02/2024 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4365 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
S1819 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2687
H4267 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4286 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4365 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - House concurred in the Senate amendment
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1278 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1278.pdf |