MA H1228 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the ability of the healthcare providers to negotiate rate increases with carriers. Health Care Financing.
Title
To prohibit inappropriate use of the state health care cost benchmark
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 1, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-08-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1228 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1228.pdf |