MA H121 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the authority of the Disabled Persons Protection Commission. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the authority of the Disabled Persons Protection Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
Rep. John Lawn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-10-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H121 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H121.pdf |