MA H1184 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a nursing advisory board within the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Public Health.
Title
Creating a nursing advisory board
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1184 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1184.pdf |