MA H1181 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4528

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring pain assessment and management in healthcare facilities. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring pain assessment and management in healthcare facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4528
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-05HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1197 (Similar To) 2017-12-07 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1183 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Senate concurred
H4528 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback