MA H1165 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential building lots. Housing.
Title
To protect residential building lots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-12-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-12-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-07 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1165 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1165.pdf |