MA H1161 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to to improve sickle cell disease care. Financial Services.
Title
To improve sickle cell care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-10-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S678 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2640
H3929 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2640 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted
H3929 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - New draft substituted, see H4178
S2475 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2640 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1161 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1161.pdf |