MA H1153 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3941
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the membership of the Stewardship Council of the Department of Conservation and Recreation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Department of Recreation and Conservation Board of Stewardship
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3941 |
2011-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Quaboag Regional High School |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3941 (Replaced by) 2012-08-02 - New draft substituted, see H4359
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1153 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11998&generalCourtId=1 |