MA H1108 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to healthcare coverage for medically necessary behavioral health bundled services delivered through community behavioral health centers. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to community behavioral health centers
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D] | Rep. Daniel Donahue [D] | Rep. Jessica Giannino [D] |
Rep. Joseph McKenna [R] | Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S654 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
S645 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H1084 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Accompanied S617
H938 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H4410
H4068 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
S645 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H1084 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Accompanied S617
H938 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied H4410
H4068 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1108 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1108.pdf |