MA H1068 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health plan coverage for medically necessary mental health crisis stabilization services. Financial Services.
Title
To further define medical necessity determinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2757 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H1997 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
H1997 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4712
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1068 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1068.pdf |