MA H1051 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-12 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special task force (including members of the General Court) to review and report on the financial impact of financial technology operations and current bank charter regulations. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to establishing a financial technology task force
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2263 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H783 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4406 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H783 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1184 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H4406 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1051 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1051.pdf |