MA H105 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4484
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to education or training activities for purposes of meeting work requirements. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To promote employment
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Peter Capano [D] | Rep. Mindy Domb [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Russell Holmes [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4484 |
2019-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S1585 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2019
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4484 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1112 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1119 (Similar To) 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
S1097 (Similar To) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1087 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
H3742 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 59 of the Acts of 2019
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H4061 (Similar To) 2020-03-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 44 of the Acts of 2020
S2336 (Similar To) 2020-05-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4097 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2020
S2401 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4484 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H105.pdf |