MA H1034 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize municipalities to invest in credit unions. Financial Services.
Title
To allow municipalities to deposit in credit unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1163 (Similar To) 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4344 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4239 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Report accepted, in concurrence
H4344 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4470 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4498 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1034 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1034.pdf |