MA H1030 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. McMurtry of Dedham, a petition of Paul McMurtry and others that the Director of the Department of Unemployment Assistance redesign the DUA QUEST online service revenue system for employers and third party agents. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Improving the QUEST system
Sponsors
Rep. Paul McMurtry [D] | Rep. James Dwyer [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] |
Rep. Colleen Garry [D] | Rep. Todd Smola [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] | Sen. Kathleen O'Connor Ives [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-07-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2078 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2450
S2450 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2554
S2554 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2450 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2554
S2554 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1030 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1030.pdf |