MA H1025 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H1080

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Accompanied H1080
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for lung cancer screenings for firefighters. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To promote cancer screenings for firefighters

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-09HouseAccompanied H1080
2024-04-11SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-28HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 1, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-07HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2023-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H3987 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4561
H4535 (Similar To) 2024-05-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4666
H4561 (Similar To) 2024-06-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2024
H1080 (Replaced by) 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4666 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4821 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback