LA SR7 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Department of Education to coordinate an awareness effort to have children screened for scoliosis.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Department of Education to coordinate an awareness effort to have children screened for scoliosis.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |