LA SR65 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Federation of Democratic Women and welcomes its members to the state capitol on May 15, 2018, in celebration of Women in Blue Day.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Federation of Democratic Women and welcomes its members to the state capitol on May 15, 2018, in celebration of Women in Blue Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |