LA SR60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs certain executive and judicial branch agencies to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports to the Senate Committee on Judiciary A until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Title
Directs certain executive and judicial branch agencies to continue to submit statutorily mandated reports to the Senate Committee on Judiciary A until such time as the mandate is specifically amended or repealed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted. |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2020-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |