LA SR31 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Brusly High School Panthers wrestling team on winning its second consecutive Division III state championship title.
Title
Commends the Brusly High School Panthers wrestling team on winning its second consecutive Division III state championship title.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] | Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2013. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |