LA SR28 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends condolences on the death of Navy Lieutenant Commander Jonas Kelsall in Afghanistan.
Title
Extends condolences on the death of Navy Lieutenant Commander Jonas Kelsall in Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 28, SR 28 BY ADLEY (#136) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27. | |
2012-04-24 | Read by title and adopted. | |
2012-04-24 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-03-27 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |