LA SR24 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-12)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 2022 as Triple-Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month in Louisiana.
Title
Designates March 2022 as Triple-Negative Breast Cancer Awareness Month in Louisiana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 24 CO-AUTHORS (#144) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/7/2022. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |