LA SR237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Tim Barfield on his many accomplishments.
Title
Commends Tim Barfield on his many accomplishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |