LA SR233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests evaluation of the Recreation and Park Commission for the parish of East Baton Rouge to ensure the board members are meeting required responsibilities.
Title
Requests evaluation of the Recreation and Park Commission for the parish of East Baton Rouge to ensure the board members are meeting required responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |