LA SR221 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends David Broussard for his passion and tireless dedication to ensuring government officials improve streets, intersections, and railroad crossings in New Iberia, Louisiana.
Title
Commends David Broussard for his passion and tireless dedication to ensuring government officials improve streets, intersections, and railroad crossings in New Iberia, Louisiana.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |