LA SR22 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-23 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Department of Revenue to create a task force to study and make recommendations to minimize employee misclassification. (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Department of Revenue to create a task force to study and make recommendations to minimize employee misclassification. (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-23SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 10/26/2020.
2020-10-20SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
2020-10-19SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2020-10-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2020-10-14SenateRules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback