LA SR192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Lynwood J. Broussard on his distinguished career of exemplary public service as justice of the peace for Ward 4 of the parish of Lafayette.
Title
Commends Lynwood J. Broussard on his distinguished career of exemplary public service as justice of the peace for Ward 4 of the parish of Lafayette.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |