LA SR19 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Grambling State University Tigers men's basketball team for their first NCAA Tournament appearance in school history.
Title
Commends Grambling State University Tigers men's basketball team for their first NCAA Tournament appearance in school history.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/28/2024. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |