LA SR159 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Passed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Louisiana Department of Health to protect the people of Louisiana from the dangers of imported seafood by immediately taking any and all action necessary to enforce the many provisions of Louisiana law relative to seafood safety.
Title
Directs the Louisiana Department of Health to protect the people of Louisiana from the dangers of imported seafood by immediately taking any and all action necessary to enforce the many provisions of Louisiana law relative to seafood safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 159 CO-AUTHORS (#922) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |