LA SR130 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana for its many contributions to the state of Louisiana.
Title
Commends the Tunica-Biloxi Tribe of Louisiana for its many contributions to the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |