LA SR13 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, April 12, 2022, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol.
Title
Designates Tuesday, April 12, 2022, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |