LA SR118 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-15 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Glorious Williams Lofton.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the passing of Glorious Williams Lofton.
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2022. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |